Company Name | YTC Resources Limited | ||||||||||||
Registered Office | YTC Resources Limited 2 Corporation Place ORANGE NSW 2800 | ||||||||||||
Principal Place of Business | YTC Resources Limited 2 Corporation Place ORANGE NSW 2800 | ||||||||||||
Sector | Materials / Mining | ||||||||||||
GISC Industry Group | Materials | ||||||||||||
Internet Homepage Address (URL) | http://www.ytcresources.com | ||||||||||||
Phone Number | (612) 6361 4700 | ||||||||||||
Fax Number | (612) 6361 4711 | ||||||||||||
Email Address | office@ytcresources.com | ||||||||||||
Financial Year End | June 30 | ||||||||||||
Board of Directors | Mr. Anthony Wehby - Chairman (Appointed on 13 December 2011) Mr. Rimas Kairaitis - Chief Executive Officer Dr. Wenxiang Gao - Non-executive Director (Appointed on 13 December 2011) Mr. Robin Chambers - Non-Executive Director Dr. Guoqing Zhang - Non-Executive Director Ms. Christine Ng - Non-Executive Director Dr. Guoqing Zhang - Alternate Director to Dr. Wenxiang Gao (Appointed on 24 November 2011) Mr. Yong Chen - Alternate Director to Ms. Christine Ng (Appointed on 5 December 2011) Mr. Gary Comb - Independent Non-executive Director (Appointed on 4 July 2012) Mr. Mark Milazzo - Non-Executive Director (Appointed on 6 August 2012) Mr. Richard Willson - Alternate Director (Appointed on 20 November 2012) Mr. Stephen Woodham - Non-Executive Director (Resigned on 6 August 2012) Mr. Richard Hill - Non-Executive Director (Resigned on 11 July 2012) | ||||||||||||
Senior Management | Mr. Rimas Kairaitis - Chief Executive Officer Mr. Richard Willson - Chief Financial Officer, Commercial Manager and Company Secretary Mr. Dean Fredericksen - Chief Operations Officer Mr. Sean Pearce - General Manager - Hera Project Mr. Ray Dekker - Project Supervisor Mr. Stuart Jeffrey - Principal Geologist - Hera & Nymagee Projects | ||||||||||||
Company Secretary | Mr. Richard Willson | ||||||||||||
Investor Relations Contact | Mr. Rimas Kairaitis and Mr. Richard Willson | ||||||||||||
Auditors and Investigating Accountant | Ernst and Young 680 George Street Sydney NSW 2000 | ||||||||||||
Solicitors | Steinepreis Paganin Lawyers and Consultants Level 4, Next Building 16 Milligan Street PERTH WA 6000 | ||||||||||||
Share Register | Security Transfer Registrars Pty Ltd 770 Canning Highway Applecross WA 6153 Telephone: (08) 9315 2333 Facsimile: (08) 9315 2233 | ||||||||||||
ASX Stock Code | YTC | ||||||||||||
Listing Date | 8 May 2007 | ||||||||||||
Shares on Issue | 252.7 m (as of 21 November 2012) | ||||||||||||
Options on Issue | 2.915 m (as of 21 November 2012) | ||||||||||||
Major Shareholders |
| ||||||||||||
Market Capitalization | $63.2 m (at 25cps) A$117 m (As of 20 March 2012) A$148 m (As of 15 August 2011) | ||||||||||||
Cash | $12.5 m (As of 30 September 2012) | ||||||||||||
Enterprise Value | $50.7 m (As of 21 November 2012) | ||||||||||||
Capital Raising |
| ||||||||||||
ABN | 37 108 476 384 | ||||||||||||
ACN | 108 476 384 |
updated 29th November, 2012
© Copyright 1996-2019 irasia.com Ltd. All rights reserved. |
DISCLAIMER: irasia.com Ltd makes no guarantee as to the accuracy or completeness of any
information provided on this website. Under no circumstances shall irasia.com Ltd be liable
for damages resulting from the use of the information provided on this website.
TRADEMARK & COPYRIGHT: All intellectual property rights subsisting in the contents of this website belong to irasia.com Ltd or have been lawfully licensed to irasia.com Ltd for use on this website. All rights under applicable laws are hereby reserved. Reproduction of this website in whole or in part without the express written permission of irasia.com Ltd is strictly prohibited. TERMS OF USE: Please read the Terms of Use governing the use of our website. |